Site Search
- resource provided by the Forum Network Knowledgebase.
Search Tip: Search with " " to find exact matches.
Kimberly Roberts
Kimberly is a National Coalition Building Institute (NCBI) trained social justice educator and facilitator with over ten years of experience leading students and professionals through anti-racism work both at home and abroad. Her passion for racial...
Kathryn O’Neal-Dunham
As Chief Operations Officer, Kathryn O’Neal-Dunham serves as an integral member of the senior management team and helps craft, direct and implement the overall strategic work of Philanthropy New York.
Philanthropy New York's Core Programs
The Philanthropy New York Core (PNY Core) features multi-part learning series that explore areas where members have requested a perennial refresher. The PNY Core are for PNY members only.
Brooklyn Community Foundation Announces New President Cecilia Clarke
Release Date:
07/01/2013
Alan Fishman, Chair of the Board of Directors of the Brooklyn Community Foundation, announced that Cecilia Clarke will join the Foundation as its new President and CEO. Ms. Clarke succeeds Marilyn Gelber, who stepped down from the post on June 30,...
Brenda Henry-Sanchez Joins the Foundation Center as Director of Research for Special Projects
Release Date:
07/01/2013
Brenda Henry-Sanchez has been appointed Director of Research for Special Projects at the Foundation Center.
Funders for LGBTQ Issues Announces New Staff
Release Date:
07/01/2013
Funders for LGBTQ Issues has announced that Lyle Matthew Kan, who served as their strategic communications consultant since February, has joined their staff on a full-time basis as Director of Communications and Education.
New York Community Trust Names David Marcus as Director of Communications and Marketing
Release Date:
07/01/2013
Pulitzer Prize-winning journalist and author David L. Marcus has joined The New York Community Trust as Director of Communications and Marketing.
Dana Laventure Joins New York State Health Foundation
Release Date:
06/03/2013
Dana Laventure has joined the staff of the New York State Health Foundation as its new Communications Associate.
Crystal Ovalles Joins Philanthropy New York as Learning Services Associate
Release Date:
05/01/2013
Crystal Ovalles has joined Philanthropy New York’s staff as our new Learning Services Associate. She is responsible for working with the Assistant Director of Learning Services in planning and managing all of Philanthropy New York’s programs and...
Jeff Trandahl Joins Arcus Foundation Board
Release Date:
03/01/2013
The Arcus Foundation has announced that Jeff Trandahl has joined its Board. Trandahl is the Executive Director and CEO of the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation (NFWF), where he leads efforts to protect and restore native species and habitats in...
Thomas H. Kean is Elected Board Chair of Carnegie Corporation of New York
Release Date:
03/01/2013
The Carnegie Corporation of New York has announced that Thomas H. Kean, former Governor of New Jersey, has been unanimously elected Chair of the Board of Trustees.
Ian Magee Joins F. B. Heron Foundation as Vice President, Finance and Operations
Release Date:
01/01/2013
The F. B. Heron Foundation has announced the appointment of Ian Magee as its new Vice President of Finance and Operations.
The Commonwealth Fund Names Adam Elshaug as its First Visiting Fellow
Release Date:
10/01/2012
Dr. Adam Elshaug, MPH, Ph.D, has become The Commonwealth Fund’s first Visiting Fellow, beginning in mid-August 2012 through June 2013. Dr
Deborah McGinn Appointed Vice President for Finance and Administration at the William T. Grant Foundation
Release Date:
08/09/2013
The William T. Grant Foundation is pleased to welcome Deborah E. McGinn as its new Vice President for Finance and Administration. In this position, she will work with the Board and its Committees to manage the Foundation's budgets, audits and...
Debora L. Spar Joins the Board of the Markle Foundation
Release Date:
09/03/2012
The Markle Foundation has announced that Debora L. Spar has joined its Board of Directors. Dr. Spar is the current President of Barnard College, a private liberal arts college for women in New York City.
Ms. Foundation for Women Selects E. Tammy Kim as Inaugural Fellow
Release Date:
09/03/2012
The Ms. Foundation for Women is pleased to announce E. Tammy Kim as its Inaugural Fellow.
Nicole Reichenbach Joins the Staff of Rockefeller Philanthropy Advisors
Release Date:
09/03/2012
Nicole Reichenbach joined Rockefeller Philanthropy Advisors (RPA) in February 2012 as Associate, Office of the President and CEO.
Arlene Rodriguez Selected for Noyes Foundation Board
Release Date:
07/02/2012
The Jessie Smith Noyes Foundation is happy to announce that Arlene Rodriguez has been voted onto their board for a six-year term.
Ira R. Halperin Named Vice Chair to Long Island Community Foundation Board
Release Date:
02/01/2012
The Long Island Community Foundation has announced the recent appointment of Ira R. Halperin to Vice Chair of its Board of Advisors. Halperin is a Partner at the law firm of Meltzer, Lippe, Goldstein & Breitstone, LLP.